21ST HENDON (3RD MILL HILL) GROUP BOY SCOUTS

Charity number: 303491
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.83k £23.07k £30.29k £49.97k £30.24k
Total expenditure £12.92k £20.28k £42.92k £28.97k £22.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A