Trustees ASDAN

Charity number: 1066927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Philip Boxer Chair 02 May 2019
None on record
Jaswinder Kaur Trustee 29 September 2022
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS AND NON-MAINTAINED SPECIAL SCHOOLS
Received: On time
Dr Kala Parasuram Shrikanth Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Victoria Fitzgerald Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
Jemma Patricia Hancock Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Jack Edward Price Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Marian Curran Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Brian Stanley Doidge Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Peter Andrew Scholey Trustee 16 June 2016
None on record