Accounts and annual returns 24TH EDMONTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 July 2019 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 July 2019 159 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window