Accounts and annual returns 4TH HARROW (COUNTY SCHOOL) BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required