2ND UPMINSTER (ST LAURENCE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.46k £13.56k £22.85k £22.09k £24.92k
Total expenditure £13.22k £16.99k £18.59k £17.54k £22.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A