2ND UPMINSTER (ST LAURENCE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Edward Jaques Trustee 11 September 2021 None on record
David Rogers Trustee None on record
MICHAEL ROOME Chair None on record
Julia Rogers Trustee 29 September 2015 None on record
DAVID BRIAN SPARKS Trustee 18 January 2012 None on record
MARIE SUGRUE Trustee 03 January 2012 None on record
MELVYN GALLAGHER Trustee 21 November 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF UPMINSTER Received: On time
LEE OWEN Trustee None on record
Michelle Louise Barkwith Trustee 11 September 2021 None on record
Olly Clark Trustee 05 July 2019 None on record
Hanah Green Trustee 07 July 2017 None on record
DEBBIE CARTER Trustee
HORNCHURCH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time