Trustees 19TH WIMBLEDON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 303793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Barnes | Chair | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hawkey | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Khan | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Bowyer | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Debnam | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Carol Clark | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Godden | Trustee | 03 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wilkins | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Gregg | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Michael Edward Mayhew | Trustee |
|
||||||
Adrian Carroll Chapman | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Paul Philip Wilkins | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Andrew Bowyer | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ian Haynes | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.