Accounts and annual returns ILFORD NORTHWEST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 303807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 11 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required