Financial history 13TH TWICKENHAM (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303823
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.45k £15.42k £12.28k £15.17k £20.90k
Total expenditure £8.68k £10.74k £10.39k £11.98k £21.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k