Accounts and annual returns 10TH LEYTON BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303863
Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 147 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 147 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 30 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 24 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required