Financial history 10TH LEYTON BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303863
Charity reporting is overdue by 153 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £4.34k £3.55k £4.01k £10.21k £18.70k
Total expenditure £3.65k £3.95k £4.67k £3.67k £5.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £18.19k