Trustees GARBOLDISHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 303955
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN RICHARD STOCKDALE | Chair | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Waldron | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
christine hannah harris mrs | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leah Webster | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Ravenhill | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Trivett | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
mary Bradbury | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Bradbury | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Jackson | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|||||
ROBERT EGGER | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.