Accounts and annual returns KING'S LYNN UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 303992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required