Financial history THE GREENWICH FOUNDATION FOR THE OLD ROYAL NAVAL COLLEGE

Charity number: 1062519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.48m £6.73m £6.64m £5.96m £5.89m
Total expenditure £5.75m £6.58m £6.90m £5.86m £6.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £968.00k £901.00k £838.00k £2.02m £1.30m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.07m £3.09m £1.73m £2.85m £1.63m
Income - Other trading activities £372.96k £668.12k £1.41m £311.79k £999.04k
Income - Charitable activities £2.85m £2.80m £3.23m £2.31m £3.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £161.39k £166.60k £182.38k £158.60k £153.02k
Income - Other £28.73k £10.56k £82.31k £324.60k £25.29k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £30.00k £135.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.88m £5.50m £5.64m £5.10m £5.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £869.32k £1.08m £1.25m £762.90k £857.74k
Expenditure - Governance £18.58k £32.25k £21.61k £21.22k £26.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0