Accounts and annual returns GREAT YARMOUTH DISTRICT SCOUTS COUNCIL

Charity number: 304137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 March 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required