Financial history Great Milton Recreation Ground Management Committee

Charity number: 304308
Charity reporting is overdue by 505 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £53.89k £6.52k £4.43k £4.89k £13.31k
Total expenditure £57.96k £7.91k £4.98k £7.04k £5.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k