Financial history 1ST MOULTON GIRL GUIDES COMPANY

Charity number: 304408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.10k £14.75k £8.14k £12.63k £3.93k
Total expenditure £5.01k £12.28k £7.68k £12.18k £9.06k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A