HUISH CHAMPFLOWER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 January 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required