THE VICTORIA FIELD CHARITY

Charity number: 304648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time Download