THE SUFFOLK COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity number: 304848
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 180 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 180 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 07 April 2021 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 07 April 2021 311 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 11 July 2017 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 July 2017 41 days late Download