SOMPTING VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £16.38k £17.94k £21.33k £16.65k £21.38k
Total expenditure £13.19k £23.26k £14.74k £33.34k £15.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £4.24k £11.57k