1ST KESGRAVE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £87.24k £81.94k £86.72k £74.93k £36.41k
Total expenditure £78.74k £83.88k £93.71k £75.53k £49.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £21.40k