THE MACCABI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 24 February 2017 On time Download