UNIVERSITIES & COLLEGES CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 306137
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Glynn Leslie Harrison Trustee 21 November 2019 None on record
Rev John L Samuel Trustee 19 November 2015 None on record
Jenny Charteris Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record
Mary Currie Chair 19 November 2014 None on record
Abigail Marthinet-Glover Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Stephen Rigby Trustee 24 November 2016
FRIENDS OF JOHANNESBURG BIBLE COLLEGE Charity reporting is up to date
DAVID LILLEY Trustee 15 March 2016 None on record
Rev A W John Stevens Trustee 24 November 2016 None on record
Rev Raymond Brown Trustee 24 November 2016 None on record
Jennifer Rosemary Brown Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record