FRIENDS OF WOODLANDS MEED

Charity number: 306356
Charity reporting is up to date (157 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £24.18k £65.66k £40.86k £44.12k £54.34k
Total expenditure £23.78k £25.75k £43.49k £16.19k £63.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A