FRIENDS OF WOODLANDS MEED

Charity number: 306356
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 April 2021 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 April 2021 157 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 February 2020 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 February 2020 95 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 October 2017 On time Download