Financial history THE FOUNDATION AND JUBILEE TRUST OF THE KING'S SCHOOL, OTTERY ST MARY

Charity number: 306662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.68k £762 £973 £291 £93
Total expenditure £618 £1.45k £914 £200 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A