PAIGNTON SCHOOL AND BELFIELD FUNDS

Charity number: 306671
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2662 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2662 days
Annual return 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3027 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3027 days
Annual return 31 March 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3393 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 05 September 2011 On time
Annual return 31 March 2010 05 September 2011 217 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Overdue Overdue by 3758 days
Annual return 31 March 2009 05 September 2011 582 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required