PAIGNTON SCHOOL AND BELFIELD FUNDS

Charity number: 306671
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £3.37k £3.57k £3.77k £3.99k £4.44k
Total expenditure £3.83k £3.49k £5.37k £3.14k £3.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A