Financial history FYFIELD OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.19k £2.25k £2.39k £2.34k £2.38k
Total expenditure £321 £3.61k £2.23k £850 £7.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A