Financial history ST OSYTH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1111865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £5.11k £18.54k £6.79k £10.86k £103
Total expenditure £6.79k £9.30k £1.84k £25.14k £454
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A