WORLD FEDERATION OF NEUROLOGY

Charity number: 1068673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr WILLIAM CARROLL Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
PROFESSOR RYUJI KAJI Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Dr WOLFGANG GRISOLD Trustee None on record
Dr Morris Freedman Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
Dr Marianne de Visser Trustee 16 July 2020 None on record
DR Richard Stark Trustee 01 November 2015 None on record
Dr Maged Abdel Naseer Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record
Professor Alla Guekht Trustee 09 October 2018 None on record
Dr STEVEN LEWIS Trustee 17 September 2014 None on record