Accounts and annual returns THE TUNBRIDGE WELLS POST GRADUATE CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 307901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window