Financial history THE TUNBRIDGE WELLS POST GRADUATE CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 307901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £52.19k £58.23k £53.07k £48.19k £16.35k
Total expenditure £79.59k £57.08k £52.96k £54.63k £20.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A