Financial history GUILDFORD FLAMES JUNIOR TRAINING PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1065691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £372 £3.12k £2.18k £2.10k £768
Total expenditure £0 £4.59k £5.03k £2.86k £2.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A