Financial history MANOR GARDENS WELFARE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1063053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.41m £1.52m £1.96m £2.04m £2.10m
Total expenditure £1.14m £1.41m £1.96m £1.83m £2.01m
Income from government contracts £499.63k £608.91k £798.16k £926.43k £1.16m
Income from government grants £15.99k £14.76k £97.28k £38.01k £61.97k
Income - Donations and legacies £342 £127 £242 £298 £33.41k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.40m £1.50m £1.94m £1.97m £2.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £761 £2.39k £3.02k £655 £178
Income - Other £10.20k £11.12k £7.43k £74.56k £3.42k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.41m £1.96m £1.83m £2.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £30 £30 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.05k £0 £6.07k £5.64k £5.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0