Financial history 6TH HASTINGS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 308190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.12k £3.48k £842 £100 £0
Total expenditure £4.31k £3.29k £2.31k £0 £473
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A