Accounts and annual returns 17TH HOVE (ST HELENS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 308230
Charity reporting is overdue by 802 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 72 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 72 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 802 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required