Financial history 17TH HOVE (ST HELENS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 308230
Charity reporting is overdue by 807 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.42k £14.68k £14.42k £29.47k £17.86k
Total expenditure £16.28k £14.06k £12.88k £13.25k £6.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £22.71k £10.67k