Financial history THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION LONDON AND SOUTH EAST ENGLAND REGION

Charity number: 308268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.12m £1.13m £1.23m £1.27m £845.65k
Total expenditure £1.11m £1.06m £1.16m £1.17m £766.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £126.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £547.82k £614.68k £714.88k £730.17k £654.09k
Income - Other trading activities £47.67k £55.14k £40.18k £86.64k £9.45k
Income - Charitable activities £516.29k £454.16k £471.96k £447.83k £49.45k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.61k £2.35k £2.59k £4.07k £5.98k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £126.67k
Income - Legacies £0 £614.68k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £1.04m £1.14m £1.11m £763.77k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £23.35k £21.24k £66.66k £2.67k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £15.73k £0 £17.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £25.27k £0 £0 £0 £0