Trustees THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION LONDON AND SOUTH EAST ENGLAND REGION
Charity number: 308268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Colson | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Chloe Healy | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ings | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jooles Parkin | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Teasel | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Roberts | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Haf Rees | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Whibley | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Lees | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.