ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1061384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £858.00k £713.00k £2.73m £682.00k £2.77m
Total expenditure £762.00k £854.00k £1.42m £957.00k £2.90m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £802.00k £663.00k £1.76m £599.00k £2.68m
Income - Other trading activities £19.00k £9.00k £5.00k £6.00k £3.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £37.00k £41.00k £58.00k £77.00k £83.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £904.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £64.00k £123.00k £518.00k £93.00k £903.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £753.00k £842.00k £1.32m £938.00k £2.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.00k £12.00k £17.00k £19.00k £16.00k
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £668.00k £771.00k £1.25m £872.00k £2.82m
Expenditure - Investment management £9.00k £12.00k £17.00k £19.00k £16.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £85.00k £0 £0