ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1061384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Palmer Trustee 12 April 2021 None on record
Kevin Orford Trustee 29 March 2021
NORTHERN DEVON HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
SUZANNE TRACEY Trustee 04 August 2008
NORTHERN DEVON HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
Steve Kirby Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Hannah Foster Trustee 05 August 2019 None on record
Dr ADRIAN HARRIS Trustee 01 April 2015
NORTHERN DEVON HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST Trustee 19 March 1997 None on record
JAMES BRENT Chair 01 May 2012
NORTHERN DEVON HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
Alastair Matthews Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Carole Burgoyne Trustee 28 June 2021 None on record
Angela Hibbard Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Carolyn Mills Trustee 18 January 2021
NORTHERN DEVON HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
PETER DILLON Trustee 29 July 2013 None on record
Brigid Kent Trustee 28 June 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR JANICE KAY Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Chris Tidman Trustee 18 September 2017 None on record