THE ROYAL ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1078046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £272.00k £200.00k £128.00k £111.00k £302.00k
Total expenditure £173.00k £164.00k £218.00k £462.00k £430.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A