THE ROYAL ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1078046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Phillips Trustee 01 February 2017 None on record
KATHRYN SALLAH Trustee 29 June 2015 None on record
Gianjeet Hunjan Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Joanne Williams Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record
Professor Phillip Anthony Begg Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
Garry Marsh Trustee 16 February 2015 None on record
David Gourevitch Chair 01 February 2017 None on record
Simone Jordan Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Matthew Revell Trustee 18 February 2019 None on record
Stephen Washbourne Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record
TIM PILE Trustee 22 August 2013 None on record