ST ANDREW'S COLLEGE, BRADFIELD

Charity number: 309089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophia Bergqvist Chair 12 February 2014
THE VINTNERS' FOUNDATION Received: On time
Graham David Leeming Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
BRUCE TOMLINSON Trustee 24 November 2017 None on record
Simon Robert James Marshall Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Simon O'Malley Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Professor Robert Van de Noort FSA PFHEA Trustee 17 March 2016 None on record
HANS PETER GANGSTED Trustee 20 February 2012
THE BRADFIELD CLUB Received: On time
THE BRITISH PILGRIMAGE TRUST CIO Received: 1 day late
Alastair Aird Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
JANET ANIELA SCARROW Trustee 19 February 2013 None on record
PATRICK BURROWES Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Catherine Hartz Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
David Mundy Trustee 01 September 2017
THE PANDA PLAYERS Received: On time
Dr Nicola Hodson Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Emma Barker Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Simon Clarkson-Webb Trustee 17 March 2016 None on record
Toby William Hornett Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
IAN M WOOD-SMITH Trustee None on record