Financial history UPTON HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 309095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.88m £2.79m £2.78m £2.93m £3.20m
Total expenditure £2.81m £2.87m £2.85m £3.10m £3.35m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.05k £7.67k £873 £312.38k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £28.67k £15.19k £25.52k £223.41k £13.83k
Income - Other trading activities £14.85k £9.68k £6.95k £5.77k £4.92k
Income - Charitable activities £2.81m £2.73m £2.72m £2.70m £3.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.02k £1.06k £1.02k £713 £643
Income - Other £24.04k £36.11k £23.82k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.81m £2.87m £2.84m £3.08m £3.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £12.40k £12.53k £12.83k
Expenditure - Governance £9.54k £9.84k £10.20k £16.46k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0