Trustees UPTON HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 309095

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virginia Barker | Chair | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Theroshene Naidoo | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||
June Gratton | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard THOMPSON | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH DOUGLAS HILL | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Wooldridge | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Rita LLOYD | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth MASON | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
RORY DAVID LEE SMYTH | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER MACIEJ WARWICKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.