Trustees MARLBOROUGH COLLEGE
Charity number: 309486

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Birkin | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Ros King | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sabina Reeves | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon Mordant AO | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Gray | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Denton | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rob Perrins | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tania Freeman | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy MARTIN-JENKINS | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Giles Ian Henderson | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Penelope Cameron Watt | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Piers COLEMAN | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir John Irving Bell | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.