Financial history AL-MASOOM INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1061821
Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.28k £20.31k £2.28k £947 £1.20k
Total expenditure £5.52k £20.07k £3.39k £662 £700
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A